Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 6:25-bk-60511
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Shivani Corp.
2385 Riverside Dr
Danville, VA 24540-4211
Represented By
H. David Cox
Cox Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
USTrustee
Office of the United States Trustee 210 First Street, Suite 505
Roanoke, VA 24011


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
29 29 5 pgs order Continuing Hearing Tue 05/06 2:53 PM
Order Granting Interim Authority to Use Cash Collateral and Request for Expedited Hearing and Related Relief Related [+]. Final hearing scheduled for 6/2/2025 at 02:00 PM Roanoke, US Bankruptcy Courtroom, 2nd Flr, 210 Church Ave., Roanoke, VA 24011. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Shivani Corp.
28 28 order Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 05/06 2:47 PM
Order Granting Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions - Authorizing Debtor to Pay Prepetition Employee Benefits and Other Compensation Related [+] (White, Kristen)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, May 05, 2025
27 27 court Hearing Held - Hearing Continued Mon 05/05 2:46 PM
Evidentiary Hearing Held - Hearing Continued Related [+] Counsel proffered testimony; Order to be Tendered by Cox; Due by 5/15/2025. Hearing scheduled 6/2/2025 at 02:00 PM Roanoke, US Bankruptcy Courtroom, 2nd Flr, 210 Church Ave., Roanoke, VA 24011. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Shivani Corp.
26 26 court Hearing Held Mon 05/05 2:43 PM
Evidentiary Hearing Held - Counsel proffered testimony; Motion Granted Related [+] Order to be Tendered by Cox; Due by 5/15/2025. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-] 12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions filed by Debtor Shivani Corp.
25 25 misc Exhibit/Witness List Mon 05/05 12:19 PM
Exhibit Revised Proposed Order Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp. Related [+]. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral ,16 Exhibit/Witness List
Saturday, May 03, 2025
24 24 misc Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 9:58 AM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp. Related [+]. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-] 19 Exhibit/Witness List
23 23 misc Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/03 9:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp. Related [+]. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-] 12 Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of Order to Pay Prepetition Wages ,14 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral ,15 Notice of Hearing,16 Exhibit/Witness List
Friday, May 02, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 24. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 05/03 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 25. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
20 20 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/02 10:24 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James D Kepley Jr on behalf of First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company. (Kepley, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Exhibit/Witness List Fri 05/02 5:23 PM
Exhibit Amended Exhibit - Amended Budget Projections Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp. Related [+]. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral
Thursday, May 01, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/02 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order of Deficiency Schedules Due
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 05/02 12:41 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order Debtor in Possession
16 16 misc Exhibit/Witness List Thu 05/01 3:48 PM
Exhibit Proposed Order Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp. Related [+]. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-] 14 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 05/01 2:33 PM
Notice of Hearing Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 5/5/2025 at 02:00 PM Roanoke, US Bankruptcy Courtroom, 2nd Flr, 210 Church Ave., Roanoke, VA 24011. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-] 12 Motion Re: Chapter 11 First Day Motions,14 Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral
14 14 motion Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Thu 05/01 2:28 PM
Motion for Conditional Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor Shivani Corp. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/01 1:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Trevor B. Reid on behalf of WBL SPO I, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, Trevor
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Wed 04/30 11:59 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions Motion for Entry of Order to Pay Prepetition Wages Filed by Debtor Shivani Corp. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference Wed 04/30 2:40 PM
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, Deadlines for Election Under 11 USC 1111 b 2, and other deadlines. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 6/11/2025 at 11:30 AM before Judge Black. All parties connect using video conference instructions on the court website. Proofs of Claims due by 7/8/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/27/2025. Pre-Status Report Due by 5/28/2025. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Shivani Corp.
10 10 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 04/30 1:40 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 10:00 AM via crmtg Ch 11: By telephone. Dial 1-877-451-9313, Passcode 9499523. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 7/28/2025. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Report Wed 04/30 10:23 AM
Report of Documents in Compliance with 11 U.S.C. §§ 1187(a), 1116(1)(A), and 1116(1)(B) Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp.. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 order Deficiency Schedules Due Tue 04/29 3:57 PM
Order of Deficiency Schedules Due . Atty Disclosure Statement due 5/13/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/13/2025. Schedule D due 5/13/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/13/2025. Schedule G due 5/13/2025. Schedule H due 5/13/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/13/2025.Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/13/2025. Form 106Dec due 5/13/2025. (White, Kristen)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing Tue 04/29 3:55 PM
Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp.. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Report Tue 04/29 3:54 PM
Report Statement Pursuant to Rule 2015(a)(4) Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp.. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order DIP - Debtor in Possession Tue 04/29 3:51 PM
Order - Debtor in Possession . (White, Kristen)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Case Assigned Tue 04/29 3:47 PM
Judge Paul M. Black added to case (White, Kristen)
Related: [-]
3 3 trustee Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee Tue 04/29 2:59 PM
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee . Peter Barrett [Ch. 11] added to the case. USTrustee. (Garber, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Verified Statement
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/29 11:50 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-60511 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A11127083. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Tue 04/29 11:49 AM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by H. David Cox on behalf of Shivani Corp. Incomplete Filings Due by 05/13/2025. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 07/28/2025. (Cox, H.)
Related: [-]