New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mark Edward Hall
Case #: 3:25-bk-14414
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Allen Marketing Group, Inc.
Princeton South Corporate Center 100 Charles Ewing Boulevard Suite 160
Trenton, NJ 08628
Represented By
Bruce J. Duke
Bruce J. Duke, LLC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:26 PM EDT
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Rachel Wolf
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Saturday, May 03, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sun 05/04 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 05/03 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Sat 05/03 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 court Notice of Hearing (Upload) Thu 05/01 8:54 AM
Notice of Hearing for: STATUS CONFERENCE. Related [+]. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 6/5/2025 at 02:00 PM, MEH - Courtroom 2, Trenton.. (mjb)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Bruce J. Duke on behalf of Allen Marketing Group, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/27/2025. filed by Debtor Allen Marketing Group, Inc.
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Show Cause Wed 04/30 1:00 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Atty Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Schedules A/B,D,G,H. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/30/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/22/2025 at 11:00 AM, by phone - Judge Hall: visit www.court-solutions.com or www.njb.uscourts.gov for more information.. (gan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 04/30 9:50 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Rachel Wolf on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Wolf, Rachel)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 04/30 8:53 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/5/2025 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 7/8/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 10/27/2025. (mmf)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Wed 04/30 7:22 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-14414 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A48091201, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 11 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/29 12:39 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Bruce J. Duke on behalf of Allen Marketing Group, Inc.. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 08/27/2025. (Duke, Bruce)
Related: [-]