Delaware District Court
Judge:Gregory B Williams
Case #: 1:25-cv-00514
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 1:09 PM EDT
Defendant
Google LLC
Plaintiff
AccuSearch Technologies LLC
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Brian A. Biggs
Ashby & Geddes
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Fri 05/09 2:26 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Chandran B. Iyer for AccuSearch Technologies LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 order SO ORDERED Thu 05/08 8:43 AM
SO ORDERED, re6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Oded Burger, Steven J. Reynolds, and Lisa Phillips filed by AccuSearch Technologies LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/8/2025. (lnb)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 05/08 8:48 AM
SO ORDERED, re9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google LLC to respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to June 20, 2025 filed by Google LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 5/8/2025. (lnb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 05/07 4:06 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Google LLC to respond to the Complaint (D.I. 1) to June 20, 2025 - filed by Google LLC. (Egan, Brian)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:27 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Gregory B. Williams. Please include the initials of the Judge (GBW) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/29 3:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by AccuSearch Technologies LLC.Google LLC served on 4/29/2025, answer due 5/20/2025. (Biggs, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 05 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Tue 04/29 12:59 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Oded Burger, Steven J. Reynolds, and Lisa Phillips. ( re6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Oded Burger, Steven J. Reynolds, and Lisa Phillips )( Payment of $ 250, receipt number ADEDC-4673383).(Biggs, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 12:34 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorneys Ronald M. Daignault, Chandran B. Iyer, Oded Burger, Steven J. Reynolds, and Lisa Phillips - filed by AccuSearch Technologies LLC.(slk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certifications by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 04/29 12:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Google LLC on 4/29/2025. (slk)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 04/29 12:27 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Bergen Innovations LLC for AccuSearch Technologies LLC filed by AccuSearch Technologies LLC. (slk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Tue 04/29 12:26 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,585,959; 10,867,001; 11,100,184; 11,971,937. (slk)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 04/29 12:25 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (slk)
Related: [-]
1 1 116 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Google LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4673307) - filed by AccuSearch Technologies LLC.(slk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet