Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:19-bk-73640

Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Frank J Santoro
Case #: 2:25-ap-07014
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department of Education (or MOHELA, as Servicer)
Represented By
United States Department of Education (or MOHELA, as Servicer)
contact info
Plaintiff
Jenna Kaye Chapman
707 Sir Walter Circle
Virginia Beach, VA 23452
Represented By
Jenna Kaye Chapman
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 court Returned Mail Mon 05/05 8:17 AM
Returned Mail for UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION (OR MOHELA) - Undeliverable - Incomplete Address Related [+] (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)6 Notice of Hearing - CerDocTyp
6 6 notice CerDocTyp - Notice of Hearing (Docketed by BNC) Sat 05/03 12:16 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] related document(s) 5 Request for Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 court BNC Forms Request (VAN-022) Notice of Hearing Wed 04/30 8:07 AM
Request for Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2025 at 10:00 AM at Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia. (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan)
Related: [-] related document(s)2 Motion to Approve filed by Jenna Kaye Chapman, Notice of Motion
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 court Entered in Error to Wrong Case Number: See entry Tue 04/29 3:42 PM
Entered in Error: See entry Related [+] (Gibbs, Latanya)
Related: [-] related document(s) 3 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference, Initial Scheduling Order
3 3 order|summon Initial Scheduling Order|Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 04/29 3:09 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR: Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to United States Department of Education (or MOHELA, as Servicer) Answer Due 6/3/2025, Initial Scheduling Order Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/17/2025 at 10:00 AM at Judge Santoro's Courtroom, 600 Granby Street, 4th Floor, Courtroom Two, Norfolk, Virginia, (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan) Modified on 4/29/2025 (Gibbs, Latanya)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Jenna Kaye Chapman
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 motion|notice Approve|Notice of Motion (if setting a hearing, do not use) Mon 04/28 3:51 PM
Motion to Approve (Seal Exhibit A to Complaint) , Notice of Motion Related [+] filed by Jenna Kaye Chapman. (Brown, Tai)
Related: [-] ument(s)1 Complaint filed by Jenna Kaye Chapman
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Mon 04/28 3:33 PM
Adversary case 25-07014 Complaint against United States Department of Education (or MOHELA, as Servicer) (Fee Amount of $350 is Exempt ) filed by Jenna Kaye Chapman. Nature of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 2:19-bk-73640 (Brown, Tai)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A