California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:25-cv-01222
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 25CV007171
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 11:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Mercedes-Benz USA LLC
Represented By
Mehgan Anne Gallagher
Theta Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Eric Allen
Represented By
Erik Whitman
Consumer Law Experts PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 05/08 1:04 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/8/2025 SETTING the Initial Scheduling Conference for 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The Parties to file status reports no later than 14 days prior to the scheduling conference; and within 7 days of this order, the parties shall complete and file the Consent to Assignment or Request for Reassignment form. (Deputy Clerk RRB) (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/05 9:38 PM
ANSWER by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC.(Gallagher, Mehgan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Tue 04/29 8:40 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Deputy Clerk VLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 25CV007171 by Mercedes-Benz USA LLC. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12185777)(Gallagher, Mehgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement