Arizona District Court
Judge:Angela M Martinez
Case #: 4:25-cv-00195
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1442 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Case in other court:Cochise County Superior Court, S0200CV202500215
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 11:04 AM MST
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance
Represented By
Steven James Gross
Cavanagh Law Firm PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurie Berus
Represented By
Alejandro Gonzales
Goldberg & Osborne - Tucson
contact info
Plaintiff
William Berus
Represented By
Alejandro Gonzales
Goldberg & Osborne - Tucson
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 motion Stay Tue 04/29 4:52 PM
MOTION to Stay STIPULATED MOTION TO STAY CASE PENDING ARBITRATION AND DISMISSING BREACH OF CONTRACT CLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF WILLIAM BERUS by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance.(Gross, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal and Stay
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 04/29 9:46 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24233043. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Angela M. Martinez. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-00195 TUC-AMM. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (VSB)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 9:37 AM
Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance. (Gross, Steven) (VSB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/29 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cochise County Superior Court, case number S0200CV202500215. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24233043 filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance. (Gross, Steven)(VSB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Acceptance Fee Check #63132; Summons (2); Complaint (2); Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Ashley Ramirez (Accounting Specialist) on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance on 4/8/2025. (Original filed in Cochise County Superior Court on 4/9/2025) (VSB) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
Related: [-]
service Service Executed Tue 04/29 9:43 AM
***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Acceptance Fee Check #63132; Summons (2); Complaint (2); Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Ashley Ramirez (Accounting Specialist) on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance on 4/8/2025. (Original filed in Cochise County Superior Court on 4/9/2025) (VSB)
Related: [-]