Oregon District Court
Judge:Michael H Simon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00706
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
4 4 oth_evt Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT Tue 04/29 9:18 AM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 4/29/2025.) (gd)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
3 3 motion Appoint Counsel Tue 04/29 9:14 AM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Tyler Scott. (gd)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 9:13 AM
Complaint. (IFP Submitted) Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Tyler Scott against All Defendants. (gd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Application for Leave to Proceed IFP Tue 04/29 9:11 AM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Tyler Scott. (gd)
Related: [-]