Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-31596

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:25-ap-03310
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 1:26 PM CDT
Defendant
MMA Law Firm, PLLC
Suite 810 1235 North Loop West
Houston, TX 77008
Represented By
Johnie J Patterson
Walker & Patterson,p.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cristobal M. Galindo P.C.
Represented By
Herbert Charles Shelton, II
Hayward PLLC
contact info
Ruth A Van Meter
Ruth A. Van Meter, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
48 48 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 05/16 8:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on MMA Law Firm, PLLC 5/16/2025. (Shelton, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
47 47 notice Notice Thu 05/15 6:23 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Progressive Casualty Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
46 46 notice Notice Thu 05/15 2:56 PM
Amended Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Southern Fidelity Insurance Company . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 11 Notice
45 45 notice Notice Thu 05/15 2:32 PM
Amended Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Maison Insurance Company . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 10 Notice
44 44 notice Notice Thu 05/15 2:31 PM
Amended Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to United Property & Casualty Insurance Company . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 14 Notice
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
43 43 court Summons Issued Wed 05/14 4:06 PM
Summons Issued on MMA Law Firm, PLLC Date Issued 5/14/2025. (bli4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
42 42 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Tue 05/13 7:05 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on MMA Law Firm PLLC c/o Registered Agent, MMA Law Firm PLLC c/o President. (Shelton, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
41 41 5 pgs motion Generic Motion (Adversary) Mon 05/12 10:49 PM
Motion TO MAINTAIN SEALED STATUS OF EXHIBITS Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Shelton, Herbert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
40 40 misc Sealed Document Mon 05/12 10:40 PM
Sealed Document (Filed By Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. ). (Shelton, Herbert)
Related: [-]
39 39 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/12 10:37 PM
Amended Complaint Related [+] (Shelton, Herbert)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit
Friday, May 09, 2025
38 38 notice Notice Fri 05/09 6:23 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to American Express National Bank . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Notice Fri 05/09 5:25 PM
Amended Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to State National Fire Insurance Company . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 12 Notice
36 36 notice Notice Fri 05/09 5:05 PM
Amended Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Americas Insurance Company . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 13 Notice
35 35 notice Notice Fri 05/09 4:56 PM
Amended Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Lighthouse Property Insurance Corporation . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 8 Notice
34 34 notice Notice Fri 05/09 4:39 PM
Amended Notice of Lighthouse Excalibur Insurance Company . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 9 Notice
33 33 notice Notice Fri 05/09 4:29 PM
Amended Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Access Home Insurance Company . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 7 Notice
32 32 notice Notice Fri 05/09 3:36 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Centauri Specialty Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice Fri 05/09 3:34 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice Fri 05/09 3:26 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Allstate Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice Fri 05/09 3:25 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Texas Farm Bureau . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice Fri 05/09 3:23 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice Fri 05/09 1:03 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Louisiana Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
26 26 notice Notice Thu 05/08 6:46 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to National General Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice Thu 05/08 6:13 PM
Amended Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum of Allied Trust Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice Thu 05/08 6:07 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Louisiana Citizens Property Insurance Corporation . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice Thu 05/08 6:05 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum of GeoVera Advantage Insurance Services, LLC . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice Thu 05/08 6:02 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum of Ocean Harbor Casualty Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice Thu 05/08 6:00 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Shelter Mutual Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice Thu 05/08 5:58 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to SageSure Insurance Managers LLC . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice Thu 05/08 5:56 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to SafePoint Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice Thu 05/08 5:52 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Gulf States Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice Thu 05/08 5:48 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to USAA Casualty Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice Thu 05/08 12:02 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena to Adam Krause, Without Prejudice . Related [+] Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-] 5 Notice
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
15 15 notice Notice Tue 05/06 9:38 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Allied Trust Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice Tue 05/06 7:38 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to United Property & Casualty Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice Tue 05/06 7:22 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum of Americas Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Tue 05/06 5:45 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to State National Fire Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice Tue 05/06 5:25 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Southern Fidelity Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice Tue 05/06 5:11 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum of Maison Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Tue 05/06 1:37 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum of Lighthouse Excalibur Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice Tue 05/06 1:16 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Lighthouse Property Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice Tue 05/06 1:05 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Access Home Insurance Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Tue 05/06 12:30 PM
Notice of Subpoena Duces Tecum to State Farm Fire & Casualty Company . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 notice Notice Fri 05/02 2:24 PM
Notice of Subpoena of Deposition of Adam Krause . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/01 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Comprehensive Scheduling Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 2 pgs notice Notice Tue 04/29 11:45 AM
Notice of Appearance of Ruth Van Meter . Filed by Cristobal M. Galindo P.C. (Van Meter, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 order Comprehensive Scheduling Order Tue 04/29 7:41 AM
Comprehensive Scheduling Order Signed on 4/28/2025 Pre-Trial Conference set for 1/14/2026 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 8B. Pre-Trial Order due by 1/5/2026. Discovery due by 10/7/2025. (njc7)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 04/28 2:12 PM
Adversary case 25-03310 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)) Complaint by Christobal M. Galindo P.C. d/b/a Galindo Law Firm against MMA Law Firm, PLLC . Receipt Number o, Fee Amount $350 (njc7)
Related: [-]