Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Christine D Little
Case #: 4:25-cv-00210
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Case in other court:Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, CJ-25-01448
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 2:05 PM CDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By
William J. Holland
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Jessica Lynn Dickerson
Mcafee & Taft (tulsa)
contact info
Plaintiff
BWL Group, LLC
Represented By
Ashley Holbrook Leavitt
Holbrook Leavitt & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
14 14 order 02 - Minute Order Fri 05/09 4:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little Plaintiff BWL Group, LLC's supplemental Disclosure Statement states that its members are "residents of the State of Oklahoma" but does not identify their citizenship. (Doc. 13 at 1); see Hargraves v. Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, No. 24-CV-00500-SEH-MTS, 2024 WL 5040926, at *1 n.1 (N.D. Okla. Dec. 9, 2024). Plaintiff is directed to file an amended statement to disclose the citizenship of each of Plaintiff BWL Group, LLC's members within seven (7) days of this Order. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 05/08 9:17 AM
Supplemental DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BWL Group, LLC (Leavitt, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
12 12 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 04/30 4:50 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley Holbrook Leavitt on behalf of BWL Group, LLC (Leavitt, Ashley)
Related: [-]
11 11 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Wed 04/30 3:11 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 5/21/2025) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
10 10 order 02 - Minute Order Wed 04/30 11:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little Plaintiff BWL Group, LLC is directed to file a supplemental disclosure statement pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1 within seven (7) days of this Order. The disclosure statement shall identify each of Plaintiff BWL Group, LLC's members and sub-members down to the level of the individual or corporation. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (CDL1, Chambers)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 04/30 11:09 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BWL Group, LLC for BWL Group, LLC) by BWL Group, LLC (Leavitt, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Tue 04/29 2:37 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
7 7 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 2:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing BWL Group, LLC and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 04/29 11:43 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William J. Holland on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Company [Note: Attorney William J. Holland added to party State Farm Fire & Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Holland, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Answer Tue 04/29 11:41 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand Related [+] by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 04/29 11:40 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company for State Farm Fire & Casualty Company) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 04/29 11:39 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Tue 04/29 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2025-1448 (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3200966) by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/29 11:36 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
cmp State Court Petition/Complaint Tue 04/29 11:23 AM
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against State Farm Fire & Casualty Company by BWL Group, LLC (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]