Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Referred: Roy S Payne
Case #: 2:25-cv-00449
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 2:07 PM CDT
Defendant
Micro-Star International Co., Ltd.
Plaintiff
SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC,


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/09 4:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC,. Micro-Star International Co., Ltd. served on 5/2/2025. (Connor, Cabrach)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 7:54 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Micro-Star International Co., Ltd.. (mdj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 04/29 2:54 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC, (Connor, Cabrach)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Tue 04/29 2:49 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Connor, Cabrach)
Related: [-]
1 1 92 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Micro-Star International Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10809910.), filed by SOVEREIGN PEAK VENTURES, LLC,.(Connor, Cabrach)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/29 4:50 PM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne added. (mdj)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Tue 04/29 4:51 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (mdj)
Related: [-]