Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-30564

California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Dennis Montali
Case #: 3:25-ap-03019
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jane Doe SF 1260
Represented By
Jane Doe SF 1260
contact info
Defendant
John Roe 417
Represented By
John Roe 417
contact info
Defendant
John Roe 499
Represented By
John Roe 499
contact info
Defendant
G.W.
Represented By
Defendant
Joseph Doe OAK 475
Represented By
Joseph Doe OAK 475
contact info
Defendant
John Doe MR 1236
Represented By
John Doe MR 1236
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe 7
Represented By
Jane Doe 7
contact info
Defendant
John PV Roe 554
Represented By
John PV Roe 554
contact info
Defendant
John Doe F.O.
Represented By
John Doe F.O.
contact info
Defendant
John Doe CLG03522
Represented By
John Doe CLG03522
contact info
Defendant
John Doe SF 1913
Represented By
John Doe SF 1913
contact info
Defendant
John Doe A.L.R.
Represented By
John Doe A.L.R.
contact info
Defendant
John Doe SF 1026
Represented By
John Doe SF 1026
contact info
Defendant
John Doe SF 1196
Represented By
John Doe SF 1196
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe SF 1200
Represented By
Jane Doe SF 1200
contact info
Defendant
John Doe SF 1201
Represented By
John Doe SF 1201
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe SF 1233
Represented By
Jane Doe SF 1233
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Doe SF 601
Represented By
Joseph Doe SF 601
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe 116
Represented By
Jane Doe 116
contact info
Defendant
John Doe H.M.
Represented By
John Doe H.M.
contact info
Defendant
C.M.
Represented By
Defendant
John Doe A.D.R.
Represented By
John Doe A.D.R.
contact info
Defendant
John DB Roe SF
Represented By
John DB Roe SF
contact info
Defendant
John Doe SF 1218
Represented By
John Doe SF 1218
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe SF 2017
Represented By
Jane Doe SF 2017
contact info
Defendant
John Roe 521
Represented By
John Roe 521
contact info
Defendant
John Roe 663
Represented By
John Roe 663
contact info
Defendant
John Doe 664
Represented By
John Doe 664
contact info
Defendant
LL John Doe WC
Represented By
LL John Doe WC
contact info
Defendant
John Doe SF 2028
Represented By
John Doe SF 2028
contact info
Defendant
John Doe SF 1510
Represented By
John Doe SF 1510
contact info
Defendant
John Doe
Represented By
John Doe
contact info
Defendant
John Roe 644
Represented By
John Roe 644
contact info
Defendant
Jane Roe
Represented By
Jane Roe
contact info
Defendant
G.J.
Represented By
Defendant
M.R.H.
Represented By
M.R.H.
contact info
Defendant
John Doe SF 1426
Represented By
John Doe SF 1426
contact info
Defendant
John Doe L.M.
Represented By
John Doe L.M.
contact info
Defendant
John Roe 457
Represented By
John Roe 457
contact info
Plaintiff
The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
One Peter Yorke Way
San Francisco, CA 94109
Represented By
Ori Katz
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter And Hampton
contact info
Paul J. Pascuzzi
Felderstein Fitzgerald Et Al LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/08 9:09 PM
Certificate of Service re: Complaint Seeking Declaratory and Injunctive Relief Under Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 362 that the Automatic Stay Extends to All State Court Cases in Which Debtor is Named as a Defendant and as to All Cases in Which a Non-Debtor Affiliate is Named as a Defendant [Adv. Docket No. 1], Order re: Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference [Adv. Docket No. 3], Corrected Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Adv. Docket No. 5] and Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet [Adv. Docket Nos. 1-2 and 1-3] Filed by Interested Party Omni Agent Solutions Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy). Modified on 5/9/2025 (myt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Discovery Order,5 Summons Issued
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 04/29 11:58 AM
Corrected Summons Issued on C.M. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe 116 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe 664 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe 7 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe A.D.R. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe A.L.R. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe CLG03522 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe F.O. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe H.M. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe L.M. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe MR 1236 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Joseph Doe OAK 475 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1026 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1196 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe SF 1200 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1201 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1218 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe SF 1233 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe SF 1260 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1426 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1510 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1913 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe SF 2017 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 2028 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Joseph Doe SF 601 Answer Due 5/29/2025; LL John Doe WC Answer Due 5/29/2025; G.J. Answer Due 5/29/2025; G.W. Answer Due 5/29/2025; M.R.H. Answer Due 5/29/2025; Pfister & Saso, LLP Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Roe Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 417 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 457 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 499 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 521 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John PV Roe 554 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 644 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 663 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John DB Roe SF Answer Due 5/29/2025 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/26/2025 at 01:30 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (rdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
4 4 misc Request for Notice Tue 04/29 9:45 AM
Request for Notice Filed by Requestor Pfister & Saso, LLP (Pfister, Robert)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Discovery Tue 04/29 9:27 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference (rdr)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 04/29 9:23 AM
Summons Issued on C.M. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe 116 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe 664 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe 7 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe A.D.R. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe A.L.R. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe CLG03522 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe F.O. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe H.M. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe L.M. Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe MR 1236 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Joseph Doe OAK 475 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1026 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1196 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe SF 1200 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1201 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1218 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe SF 1233 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe SF 1260 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1426 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1510 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 1913 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Doe SF 2017 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Doe SF 2028 Answer Due 5/29/2025; Joseph Doe SF 601 Answer Due 5/29/2025; LL John Doe WC Answer Due 5/29/2025; G.J. Answer Due 5/29/2025; G.W. Answer Due 5/29/2025; M.R.H. Answer Due 5/29/2025; Jane Roe Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 417 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 457 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 499 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 521 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John PV Roe 554 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 644 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John Roe 663 Answer Due 5/29/2025; John DB Roe SF Answer Due 5/29/2025 Related [+]. Scheduling Conference scheduled for 6/27/2025 at 01:30 PM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (rdr) DEFECTIVE ENTRY: Clerk docketed in error. Please see the corrected summons on doc #5. Modified on 4/29/2025 (rdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/28 6:53 PM
Adversary case 25-03019 72 (Injunctive relief - other), 91 (Declaratory judgment) Complaint by The Roman Catholic Archbishop of San Francisco against John DB Roe SF, John Doe H.M., John Doe SF 1218, Jane Doe SF 2017, John Roe 521, John Roe 663, John Doe 664, LL John Doe WC, John Doe SF 2028, John Doe SF 1510, John Doe, John Roe 644, Jane Roe, G.J., M.R.H., John Doe SF 1426, John Doe L.M., John Roe 457, John Doe A.D.R., John Doe A.L.R., John Roe 417, John Roe 499, G.W., Joseph Doe OAK 475, John Doe MR 1236, Jane Doe 7, John PV Roe 554, John Doe F.O., John Doe CLG03522, John Doe SF 1913, Jane Doe SF 1260, John Doe SF 1026, John Doe SF 1196, Jane Doe SF 1200, John Doe SF 1201, Jane Doe SF 1233, Joseph Doe SF 601, Jane Doe 116. Fee Amount $350. (Katz, Ori)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 AP Cover Sheet
Att: 3 Attachment Sheet to Adversary Cover Sheet