Hawaii District Court
Judge:Jill A Otake
Referred: Kenneth J Mansfield
Case #: 1:25-mc-00157
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 3:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING Defendant Tabitha K. Mattos's Request for Court Appointed Attorney - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/30/2025. Attorney Stanton Oshiro for Tabitha K. Mattos added. (cib)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 order CJA 20 - Appointment Tue 04/29 8:11 AM
CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Stanton C. Oshiro for Tabitha K. Mattos - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/28/2025. Nunc Pro Tunc: 4/25/2025. (cib)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Financial Affidavit - CJA 23 Tue 04/29 8:08 AM
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Tabitha K. Mattos **Document Restricted** . (cib)
Related: [-]