Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:25-cv-80522
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 6:05 PM EDT
Defendant
Daniel B. Kelley Attorney at Law LLC
Defendant
Parking Revenue Recovery Services Inc
Plaintiff
Matthew Meinzer
Represented By
Thomas John Patti, III
Patti Zabaleta Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order of Requirements Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 05/08 3:47 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/8/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/30 1:42 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Matthew Meinzer (Patti, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Wed 04/30 1:38 PM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Matthew Meinzer (Patti, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Wed 04/30 9:11 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorney listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (blc)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 9:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Daniel B. Kelley Attorney at Law LLC, Parking Revenue Recovery Services Inc. (blc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 04/30 8:47 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (blc)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18408662, filed by Matthew Meinzer.(Patti, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 1 pgs Summon(s),
Att: 3 1 pgs Summon(s),
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit