Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00484
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 05/07 1:47 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for William True admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/01 1:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William True on behalf of State of Tennessee (True, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 04/29 4:38 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 04/29 4:38 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/29 4:37 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 300005502.), filed by Leon Flannel.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Various documents,
Att: 2 Attachment Receipt
misc Annotation - Docket Tue 04/29 4:40 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc)
Related: [-]