Tennessee Western District Court
Judge:S Thomas Anderson
Referred: Jon A York
Case #: 1:25-cv-01110
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 5:06 PM CDT
Defendant
Southern Trust Insurance Company
5444 Riverside Drive
Macon, GA 31210
Plaintiff
Todd Gamble
Represented By
John P. Wills
John P. Wills Attorney At Law
contact info
Michael P. Coury
Glankler Brown, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 05/07 3:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Todd Gamble. Southern Trust Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/2/2025, answer due 7/1/2025. (Coury, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 notice Notice LR 72.1 - Right to Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form (form AO 85) is available on the US Courts website at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms-rules/forms. (skc)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice ADR Compliance Tue 04/29 4:57 PM
NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice LR 16.2 Tue 04/29 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 04/29 4:55 PM
Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Wills on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wills, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Southern Trust Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNWDC-4677329), filed by Todd Gamble.(Coury, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- Insurance Policy