New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:25-bk-71669
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cozy Nest Homes, LLC
15307 Foch Blvd
Jamaica, NY 11434-1522
Represented By
Cozy Nest Homes, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722
US Trustee Trial Attorney
Stan Y Yang
Office of the United States Trustee Central Islip Office Alfonse M D'Amato US Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/30 12:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Courtney Jeanne Killelea on behalf of WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND, FSB, D/B/A CHRISTIANA TRUST, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACTIY BUT SOLELY AS OWNER TRUSTEE OF RESIDENTIAL CREDIT OPPORTUNITIES TRUST II, c/o BSI FINANCIAL SERVICES (Killelea, Courtney)
Related: [-]
4 4 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Wed 04/30 9:46 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/29/2025 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-0538, Participant Code 4551117, Enter # sign. (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Tue 04/29 3:04 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 4/29/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 4/29/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 4/29/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 4/29/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 4/29/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/13/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/13/2025. Schedule D due 5/13/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/13/2025. Schedule G due 5/13/2025. Schedule H due 5/13/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 5/13/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/13/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/13/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/13/2025. (gem)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Hearing of Defective or Deficient Filing of Non-Individual Chapter 11 Case Tue 04/29 3:00 PM
Notice of Hearing on Deficient Chapter 11 Case for Debtor's Failure to be Represented by Counsel.Hearing scheduled for 5/19/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. Chapter 11 Non-Individual Attorney Cure due by 5/13/2025. Related [+] (gem)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Cozy Nest Homes, LLC
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/29 1:18 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Cozy Nest Homes, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/27/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 8/27/2025. (gem)
Related: [-]
court Prior Filings Tue 04/29 1:18 PM
[LINK:Prior Filing] Case Number(s): 25-70314 reg , dismissed:03/04/2025 (gem)
Related: [-]
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Auto Tue 04/29 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00. Receipt Number 10335977. (GM) (admin)
Related: [-]