Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 2:25-bk-21098
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
LoZo Enterprises, LLC
280 Market Ln Ste 701
Wexford, PA 15090-5602
Represented By
David Z. Valencik
Calaiaro Valencik
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222


Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
14 14 order With Notice Thu 05/01 11:46 AM
Order With Notice That the Debtor Shall Within 30 Days of Bar Date Serve a Completed Notice and File a Certificate of Service Within 14 Days. cm:David Z. Valencik, Esq. Signed on 5/1/2025. (dpas)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Business/Corporation Thu 05/01 11:40 AM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/28/2025 at 02:00 PM Ch 11 341 telephonic hearing. Last day to oppose dischargeability due by 7/28/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 6/30/2025. (dpas)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Thu 05/01 10:11 AM
Certificate of Service Regarding the Hearing on 6/18/2025. Filed by Debtor LoZo Enterprises, LLC Related [+]. (Valencik, David)
Related: [-] :11 Order Scheduling a Hearing
Att: 1 Mailing matrix
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 court Hearing Set E Wed 04/30 4:21 PM
Order Establishing Case Management Deadlines (Subchapter V Small Business Case) Related [+]. Status Conference scheduled for 6/18/2025 at 01:30 PM via p03 Courtroom C, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. (jmar)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor LoZo Enterprises, LLC
10 10 trustee Notice of Appointment of Trustee Wed 04/30 10:38 AM
Notice of Appointment of William G Krieger, Trustee. Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. (Villacorta, Marta)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement
9 9 court Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies Wed 04/30 9:48 AM
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies. Assigned Judge: MELARAGNO.. Pursuant to Local Rule 1017-2, the United States Trustee is deemed to have filed a Motion To Dismiss this case, and that Motion will be deemed GRANTED, if any deadline set forth in the first docket entry or any of the following deadlines is not met. Incomplete Filings: LIST OF EQUITY SECURITY HOLDERS DUE 5/13/2025, SCHEDULE D DUE 5/13/2025, SCHEDULE G DUE 5/13/2025, SCHEDULE H DUE 5/13/2025, BALANCE SHEET DUE 5/6/2025, STATEMENT OF OPERATIONS DUE 5/6/2025, CASH-FLOW STATEMENT DUE 5/6/2025, AND TAX INFORMATION DUE 5/6/2025. Related [+]. (dpas)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor LoZo Enterprises, LLC
8 8 utility Corrective Entry Wed 04/30 9:44 AM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: A MEMBER OF THE CLERKS OFFICE HAS TERMINATED DEADLINES FOR THE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND CHAPTER 11 PLAN. THE CHAPTER 11 SMALL BUSINESS SUBCHAPTER V PLAN DEADLINE IS 7/28/2025. THE DEADLINE FOR THE EMPLOYEE INCOME RECORDS HAS ALSO BEEN TERMINATED AS NOT REQUIRED FOR THIS DEBTOR. Related [+]. (dpas)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor LoZo Enterprises, LLC
7 7 utility Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines Wed 04/30 9:40 AM
Plan Deadlines Updated Related [+]. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan due by 7/28/2025. (dpas)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor LoZo Enterprises, LLC
6 6 utility Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines Wed 04/30 9:38 AM
Deadlines Updated Related [+]. Balance Sheet due by 5/6/2025. Cash Flow Statement due by 5/6/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/13/2025. Schedule D due 5/13/2025. Schedule G due 5/13/2025. Schedule H due 5/13/2025. Statement of Operations due by 5/6/2025. Tax Information due by 5/6/2025. (dpas)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor LoZo Enterprises, LLC
5 5 crditcrd none Wed 04/30 9:00 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 25-21098 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A17145585, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 04/30 8:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by William M. Buchanan Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the United States Trustee (Buchanan, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 04/29 4:37 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. ; Filed by Debtor LoZo Enterprises, LLC (Valencik, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29 Tue 04/29 4:35 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor LoZo Enterprises, LLC (Valencik, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Tue 04/29 4:34 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Subchapter V Fee Amount $1738 Filed by LoZo Enterprises, LLC Government Proof of Claim due by 10/25/2025. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 05/13/2025. Chapter 11 Plan due by 08/27/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 08/27/2025. Atty Disclosure Statement due 05/13/2025. Declaration of Schedules due 05/13/2025. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 05/13/2025. Schedule A/B due 05/13/2025. Schedule E/F due 05/13/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/13/2025. Summary of schedules due 05/13/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/13/2025. (Valencik, David)
Related: [-]