California Eastern District Court
Judge:Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:25-cv-00497
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 5:05 PM PDT
Petitioner
Prince Peters
425 Golden State Ave
Bakersfield, CA 93301
Represented By
Jordan Wells
Lawyers Committee For Civil Rights Of The San Francisco Bay
contact info
Victoria Celeste Petty
Lawyers Committee For Civil Rights Of The San Francisco Bay
contact info
Respondent
Minga Wofford
Facility Administrator of Mesa Verde ICE Detention Center 425 Golden State Ave
Bakersfield, CA 93301
Represented By
Michelle Rodriguez
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Ex Parte Application Tue 05/06 11:58 AM
ORDER DENYING Petitioner's4 Application for Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/6/2025. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 order 06 - HC/Order Requiring Respondent to File a Response Mon 05/05 2:20 PM
ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/5/2025. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Respondent. Consent or Decline due by 7/10/2025. (Deputy Clerk TEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 motion Ex Parte Application Fri 05/02 7:26 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION by Prince Peters for ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE.(Petty, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Tue 04/29 4:29 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/2/2025. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
2 2 utility Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/29 3:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Prince Peters. (Petty, Victoria)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/29 2:57 PM
PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Minga Wofford by Prince Peters. (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ACAEDC-12188912)(Petty, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Bridget Cambria