Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-54710
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Nautica's Edge LLC
1503 Riveredge Pkwy
Atlanta, GA 30328
Represented By
Michael D. Robl
Robl Law Group LLC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
11 11 motion 09-Motion for Leave of Absence Thu 05/08 10:03 AM
Motion for Leave of Absence from May 14, 2025 to September 2025 filed by Maxwell William Bowen on behalf of Nautica's Edge LLC. (Bowen, Maxwell)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
10 10 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Sun 05/04 12:54 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Sun 05/04 12:54 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 05/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees Thu 05/01 7:28 AM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1,738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 5/1/2025. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 1
7 7 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Thu 05/01 7:20 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 5/27/2025 at 01:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) Non-Government Proof of Claims due by 7/8/2025. Status Conference to be held on 6/18/2025 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1204, Atlanta. (cws)
Related: [-]
misc Deadline for Filing Pre-Status Conference Report Thu 05/01 7:20 AM
Deadline: Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 6/4/2025. (cws)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Thu 05/01 8:51 AM
Receipt of Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-54710 ) [misc,4002aty] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A63141852. Fee Amount 1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 trustee Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Wed 04/30 10:05 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee - Todd E. Hennings filed by Trustee. (Adams, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 notice Notice (BK) Wed 04/30 11:37 AM
Notice of no Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash-Flow Statement, and Tax Returns Filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Nautica's Edge LLC. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc P-Corporate Resolution Wed 04/30 10:12 AM
Corporate Resolution filed by Michael D. Robl on behalf of Nautica's Edge LLC. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 9:00 AM
Amended Notice of Appearance Filed by Jonathan S. Adams on behalf of United States Trustee. (Adams, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 8:58 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Jonathan S. Adams on behalf of United States Trustee. (Adams, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 28 pgs misc Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 04/29 7:50 PM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) for Non-Individual Subchapter V Filed by Michael D. Robl of Robl Law Group LLC on behalf of Nautica's Edge LLC. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 07/28/2025. (Robl, Michael)
Related: [-]