New York Southern District Court
Judge:Gregory H Woods
Case #: 1:25-cv-03565
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:11 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff
Environmental Defense Fund
Represented By
Justin M. Sher
Sher Tremonte LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 05/06 7:36 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 5/6/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Environmental Defense Fund..(Sher, Justin)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 05/06 7:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Environmental Protection Agency c/o U.S. Attorney General served on 5/6/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Environmental Defense Fund..(Sher, Justin)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Tue 05/06 7:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Environmental Protection Agency c/o Civil Process Clerk of the U.S. Attorney's Office served on 5/6/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. Service was made by Certified Mail. Document filed by Environmental Defense Fund..(Sher, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 4:43 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Environmental Protection Agency. (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/02 3:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Environmental Defense Fund..(Sher, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 04/30 11:53 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties participate in an initial conference with the Court at the time listed below. July 17, 2025 at 4:00 p.m. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The parties are directed to the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which are available on the Court's website. Rule 2 of the Court's Individual Rules contains the dial-in number for the conference and other relevant instructions. The parties are specifically directed to comply with Rule 2(C) of the Court's Individual Rules. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/17/2025 at 04:00 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/30/2025) (sgz)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 10:51 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Moe on behalf of Environmental Defense Fund..(Moe, Alison)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 04/30 9:43 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/30 9:43 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 04/30 9:43 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 04/30 9:44 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Justin M. Sher. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 04/29 7:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sher, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 7:25 PM
COMPLAINT against U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31004918)Document filed by Environmental Defense Fund..(Sher, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13