Connecticut District Court
Judge:Omar A Williams
Case #: 3:25-cv-00677
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Canai Adger
Defendant
Mararet Bait
Defendant
Kathryn Cavicchi
Defendant
Hartford Board of Ed
Defendant
Emilie Rozario
Defendant
Joshua Scherer
Defendant
JoAnn Trimbly Jackson
Plaintiff
Edwin James, 3rd
8 Sterling St.
Hartford, CT 06112
Plaintiff
Nerissa Terry


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
13 13 service USM Service Info to IFP Plaintiff Fri 05/02 9:47 AM
USM 285 forms together with Summons/Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, all Intake Orders, Order granting IFP, Consent to Electronic Notice, Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing, and Guide for Self-Represented Litigants and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
12 12 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 05/01 4:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Board of Ed, JoAnn Trimbly Jackson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Nerissa Terry* *8 Sterling St.* *Hartford, CT 06112*. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Electronic Service Documents Thu 05/01 4:23 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,6 Standing Protective Order, 9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,5 Electronic Filing Order, Notice re: Non-Prisoner Pro Se Cases,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nerissa Terry, 3 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint, filed by Nerissa Terry,8 Standing Order re: Letters Signed by Clerk on 05/01/2025.(Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Docket Annotation Thu 05/01 12:40 PM
Docket Entry Correction re1 Complaint, Redacted Complaint added. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/30 6:33 PM
ORDER granting ECF No. 12 , Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff has shown that paying the attendant filing fees in this case would be a financial hardship, and thus the court finds the indigency requirement is satisfied. It is not entirely clear if Plaintiff has exhausted all administrative remedies, as generally is required under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act ("IDEA"), 20 U.S.C. § 1400 et seq., or if the exhaustion requirements may be excused in this case. Murphy v. Arlington Cent. Sch. Dist. Bd. of Educ. , 297 F.3d 195, 199 (2d Cir. 2002) (noting circumstances in which exhaustion is not necessary under the IDEA). The court will allow the action to proceed to service, but reserves ruling on the issue of exhaustion until the defendants have appeared. Therefore, the motion to proceed in forma pauperis hereby is granted. The Clerk of Court is asked, respectfully, to please send Plaintiff the forms necessary to effect service by the United States Marshals Service. Further, as one of the plaintiffs is a minor, the Clerk of Court is asked, with the court's thanks, to please change the docket caption so that the minor plaintiffs name reads "E.J." and to redact the complaint such that every mention of the minor's name refers to the same initials. The complaint docketed at ECF No. 1 shall be sealed and the redacted complaint shall be docketed in its place. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/30/25. (Wagner, R)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
8 8 intord Standing Order re: Letters Tue 04/29 2:43 PM
Standing Order re: Letters. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/28/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Tue 04/29 2:39 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Tue 04/29 2:37 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/28/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 04/29 2:36 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 04/28/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 04/29 2:35 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2025; Discovery due by 10/28/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2025, Signed by Clerk on 04/28/2025. (Kelsey, N)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 1:03 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 4/28/2025.(Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 04/29 12:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nerissa Terry. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 12:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Canai Adger, Mararet Bait, Kathryn Cavicchi, Hartford Board of Ed, Emilie Rozario, Joshua Scherer, JoAnn Trimbly Jackson, filed by Nerissa Terry. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
utility NEW Case Assignment Tue 04/29 1:54 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Omar A. Williams assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]