Barcliff, LLC v. M/V Deep Blue, IMO No. 9215359
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William E Cassady |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00590 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Marine-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Dec 19, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 21, 2016 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 17, 2015 8:44 AM CDT |
Defendant
M/V Deep Blue, IMO No. 9215359
|
Represented By
|
Non-Party
ING Bank N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barcliff, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
114 | 114
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
Tue 03/06 12:21 PM
ORDER granting111 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 3/6/2018. (eec) |