Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:25-cv-02364
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:12 AM EDT
Defendant
D.L. Williams Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Aleksandra Mitchell
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Defendant
Darnell Williams
Represented By
Matthew Peter Stone
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Shawn N. Kalfus
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Aleksandra Mitchell
Stone Kalfus LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenequa Ligon
Represented By
Kendall Shortway
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 discov Initial Disclosures Fri 05/09 3:08 PM
Initial Disclosures by D.L. Williams Enterprises, LLC, Darnell Williams.(Mitchell, Aleksandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 30+ pgs order Order Wed 04/30 12:18 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/30/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 misc Leave of Absence Tue 04/29 3:12 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 30-July 11, July 25-August 15, October15-October 17, November 26-December 2, December 22-January 7,2026, by Matthew Peter Stone. (Stone, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Tue 04/29 3:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re1 Notice of Removal, filed by D.L. Williams Enterprises, LLC, Darnell Williams(Kalfus, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Filing
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 3:06 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by D.L. Williams Enterprises, LLC, Darnell Williams identifying Corporate Parent Darnell Williams for D.L. Williams Enterprises, LLC. (Kalfus, Shawn)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Jury Demand Tue 04/29 3:04 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by D.L. Williams Enterprises, LLC, Darnell Williams. (Kalfus, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Tue 04/29 2:19 PM
ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by D.L. Williams Enterprises, LLC and Darnell Williams. Discovery ends on 9/25/2025.(dgr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 04/29 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Darnell Williams and D.L. Williams Enterprises, LLC. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-14254876)(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Filings with Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Communications,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet