Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Geraghty
Case #: 1:25-cv-02367
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Jared Michael Levitt
Interested Party
All Nations Investors LLC
Interested Party
GBRE, LLC
Plaintiff
Truist Bank
Represented By
Kevin Allen Maxim
The Maxim Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
James C. Manning
Moore & Van Allen Pllc-Charlotte
contact info
William D. Curtis
Moore & Van Allen Pllc-Charlotte
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 05/09 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Truist Bank (Maxim, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Mon 05/05 1:10 PM
Return of Service Executed by Truist Bank. Jared Michael Levitt served on 5/3/2025, answer due 5/27/2025. (Maxim, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 04/29 2:15 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to James C. Manning. Clerk to follow-up by 5/9/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 04/29 2:12 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to William D. Curtis. Clerk to follow-up by 5/9/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/29 10:37 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Jared Michael Levitt. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 10:34 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Truist Bank identifying Other Affiliate Truist Financial Corporation for Truist Bank. (cpp)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 10:32 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Truist Bank. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14255877)(cpp) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet