Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Leigh Martin May
Case #: 1:25-cv-02370
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:216(b) Labor - Minimum wage or overtime compensation
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:12 AM EDT
Defendant
NanoLumens, Inc.
Plaintiff
Alan Kyle
Represented By
Kurt G. Kastorf
Kastorf Law, LLC
contact info
Rod M. Johnston
Johnston Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 12:39 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Rod Johnston Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14285853).by Alan Kyle. (Kastorf, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 2:28 PM
NOTICE REGARDING FLSA CASES Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/30/2025. (bnp)
Related: [-]
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Wed 04/30 1:35 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/30/2025. (bnp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 04/29 11:29 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Rod M. Johnston. Clerk to follow-up by 5/9/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/29 10:54 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to NanoLumens, Inc.. (tcc)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alan Kyle. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14256629)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet