Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:25-cv-02381
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Carlos Peters
Plaintiff
Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By
Jefferson Mulloy Starr
Coleman Talley LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 3:09 PM
ORDER (by docket entry only) granting6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Henry Lee Falls, III. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 5/8/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dnb)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 05/08 9:26 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:6 APPLICATION for Admission of Henry Lee Falls, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14277458). Attorney Henry Lee Falls, III added appearing on behalf of Farmers Insurance Exchange. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 8:16 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Henry Lee Falls, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14277458).by Farmers Insurance Exchange.(Starr, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
utility Refund Request Processed Tue 05/06 2:29 PM
Refund in the amount of $405.00 has been processed, effective 5/6/2025 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
misc Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online Fri 05/02 1:45 PM
Clerks Approval re5 Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number AGANDC-14257199.(mec)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 misc Application for Refund of Fees paid online Thu 05/01 1:58 PM
Application for Refund of Fees paid online through Pay.gov for receipt number 5945864. (Starr, Jefferson)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Wed 04/30 12:19 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 4/30/2025. (tas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 04/29 2:43 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Carlos Peters. (ane)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/29 2:42 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farmers Insurance Exchange identifying Other Affiliate Farmers Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group Ltd., f/k/a Zurich Financial Services Ltd. for Farmers Insurance Exchange. (ane)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 04/29 2:36 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Farmers Insurance Exchange. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14257841)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet