Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:25-cv-00174
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 10:08 PM CDT
Defendant
Vicki Israel
Defendant
Melissa McClure
Defendant
Amy Montes
Defendant
State of Texas DFPS
Plaintiff
Gabryelle Daniels
In the Interest of D.D., a minor 806 N. 2nd Street
Copperas Cove, TX 76522
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cheryl Mabrey
Terminated: 03/05/2025
Defendant
Chuck Stermer
Terminated: 03/05/2025


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
25 25 misc Case Opening Letter Wed 04/30 4:34 PM
Case Transfer Letter sent to 806 N. 2nd Street Copperas Cove, TX 76522. (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/29 3:45 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. (bw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 10:37 AM
ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that the above-titled case is TRANSFERRED to the Waco Division. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
23 23 NOTICE by Gabryelle Daniels (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
ORDER. Within fourteen days, the Parties shall submit a Proposed Amended Scheduling Order that matches Judge Albright's template (available under Austin Division Standing Orders). Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (nnw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabryelle Daniels. Amy Montes served on 4/4/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. (pg)
Related: [-]
20 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabryelle Daniels. Vicki Israel served on 4/4/2025, answer due 4/25/2025. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
18 18 NOTICE by Gabryelle Daniels (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
17 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by D. Daniels, Gabryelle Daniels as to Melissa McClure. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
16 16 Summons Issued as to Vicki Israel, Melissa McClure, Amy Montes, State of Texas DFPS. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
15 15 Certified Mail Receipt of14 Order Adoptingg Report and Recommendations. (pg)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for8 Report and Recommendations. The Court ORDERS that the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge, (Dkt.8 ), is ADOPTED. Plaintiff's claims against Chuck Stermer and Cheryl Marbrey are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Plaintiffs' claims against the other defendants remain pending and will proceed in this litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff via certified mail. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 RESPONSE by Gabryelle Daniels. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint by Gabryelle Daniels.(pg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
10 10 Letter/Correspondence from Gabryelle Daniels. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
9 9 Certified Mail Receipt of8 Report and Recommendations. (pg)
Related: [-]
8 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Gabryelle Daniels, D. Daniels,1 Complaint filed by Gabryelle Daniels, D. Daniels, CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 RESPONSE to5 Order for More Definite Statement by Gabryelle Daniels. (pg)
Related: [-]
6 6 Returned Signed Certified Mail Receipt of5 Order for More Definite Statement (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, Statement due 12/13/2024. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
4 4 STANDING ORDER (dated 02/21/2020) REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (cr5)
Related: [-]
3 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to State of Texas DFPS on 11/03/2024 by Gabryelle Daniels, D. Daniels (cr5)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gabryelle Daniels, D. Daniels. (cr5)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT (IFP PENDING), filed by D. Daniels, Gabryelle Daniels.(cr5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cr5)
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (cr5)
Related: [-]