Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:James D Cain, Jr
Referred: Thomas P Leblanc
Case #: 2:25-cv-00570
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
2 2 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Tue 04/29 9:02 PM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/29/2025. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 04/29 9:36 AM
DEFICIENT ? PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Esposito.(crt,Bowman, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/29 8:56 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]