Louisiana Western District Court
Case #: 5:25-cv-00580
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Case in other court:Louisiana Middle, 3:25-cv-00339
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 10:05 PM CDT
Defendant
Michele Dauzat
Plaintiff
Cody C Dantin
515835 David Wade Correctional Center 670 Bell Hill Rd
Homer, LA 71040


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
5 5 transfer District Transfer In Tue 04/29 5:10 PM
DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:25-cv-00339. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 3:51 PM
GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/29/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/29 3:50 PM
Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/29/2025. (JEG) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/29/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
2 2 There is no record document 2. Entered in error by the Case Administrator CIS. Modified on 04/29/2025 to edit the text and remove the document. [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/29/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (CIS) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/29/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against Michele Dauzat, filed by Cody C. Dantin. (CIS) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 4/29/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter