California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 2:25-bk-13544
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 03, 2025

Debtor
KK ENGG LLC
3877 Dwiggins St
Los Angeles, CA 90063-2007
Represented By
Jasmine Firooz
Law Offices Of Jasmine Firooz
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Rosendo Gonzalez (TR)
Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C. 530 S. Hewitt Street, Suite 148
Los Angeles, CA 90013
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 12:39 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/29 3:53 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:2:25-bk-13544] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58352946. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/29 3:36 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by KK ENGG LLC (Firooz, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Tue 04/29 7:13 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Gonzalez (TR), Rosendo with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/3/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Gonzalez: Meeting ID 987 345 9194, Passcode 5564413706, Phone 1 213 592 3540. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]