California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:25-bk-11131
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 09, 2025

Debtor
Ophthalmology Corporation
PO Box 2020
Manhattan Beach, CA 90267-2020
Represented By
Rosendo Gonzalez
Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Thomas H Casey (TR)
26400 La Alameda, Suite 210
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 12:40 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/29 1:37 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:25-bk-11131] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58351743. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/29 1:35 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Ophthalmology Corporation (Gonzalez, Rosendo)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Tue 04/29 2:05 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Casey (TR), Thomas H with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/9/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Casey: Meeting ID 512 832 0978, Passcode 1364952669, Phone 1 657 222 4959. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account) Notice not generated. See docket entry #3 for correct notice. Modified on 4/29/2025 (TS)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset/No POC) (309A/309C) Tue 04/29 3:21 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Thomas H Casey (TR) with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/9/2025 at 09:00 AM at Zoom - Casey: Meeting ID 512 832 0978, Passcode 1364952669, Phone 1 657 222 4959. (TS)
Related: [-]