California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Theodor Albert
Case #: 8:25-bk-11132
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 09, 2025

Debtor
Southern California Eye Physicians & Surgeons Corp.
10861 Cherry St Ste 208
Los Alamitos, CA 90720-5407
Represented By
Rosendo Gonzalez
Gonzalez & Gonzalez Law, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Thomas H Casey (TR)
26400 La Alameda, Suite 210
Mission Viejo, CA 92691
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 12:41 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 04/29 1:45 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK:8:25-bk-11132] ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58351796. Fee amount 338.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 04/29 1:41 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Southern California Eye Physicians & Surgeons Corp. (Gonzalez, Rosendo)See docket entry #3 for correction. Incomplete filing due in 72 hours deadline due by 5/2/2025. Modified on 4/29/2025 (VN)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (No Asset) (B/Corp No POC) (309C) (AutoAssign) Tue 04/29 2:05 PM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Casey (TR), Thomas H with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/9/2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom - Casey: Meeting ID 512 832 0978, Passcode 1364952669, Phone 1 657 222 4959. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment, shared account)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Tue 04/29 4:28 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (VN)
Related: [-]