Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-08262
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 12:19 AM MST
Defendant
Macario Perez-Moreno (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Vanessa Anne Kubota
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:12 AM MST
Saturday, April 26, 2025
Arrest of Macario Perez-Moreno on 4/26/2025. (KGM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Macario Perez-Moreno. (KGM)
Related: [-]