Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-01536
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 12:23 AM MST
Defendant
Jose Luis Hernandez (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William J George
Us Attorneys Office - Yuma, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:20 AM MST
Friday, April 25, 2025
Arrest of Jose Luis Hernandez on 4/25/2025. (NM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Luis Hernandez. (NM)
Related: [-]