California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:25-mj-02140
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 12:33 AM PDT
Defendant
Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez (1)
Represented By
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Matthew Luevano
Federal Defenders Of San Diego Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Allison Rogge
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:37 AM PDT
Sunday, April 27, 2025
Arrest of Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez.(gac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez: Initial Appearance set for 4/28/2025 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 5/22/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/8/2205 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. (no document attached) (vyc)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Allison Rogge appearing for USA. (Rogge, Allison)Attorney Allison Rogge added to party USA(pty:pla) (yxc).
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 4/28/2025. (axc1)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez held on 4/28/2025. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez. Bond set as to Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez (1) No Bail - Government Motion to Detain (Flight). Preliminary Hearing set for 5/8/25 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Arraignment set for 5/22/25 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard.( Detention Hearing - RF set for 4/30/2025 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard.) (Interpreter Alejandro Rodriguez). (CD# 4/28/2025 LR 125-157). (Plaintiff Attorney Anna Sebastian AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Bacilio Varela FD). (ecf)
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight) by USA as to Raul Velazquez-Rodriguez. (no document attached) (ecf)
Related: [-]