Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00230
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 2:19 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Probation Department
contact info
Jimmy Lorenzo Arce
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Larby Amirouche (1)
Terminated: 04/28/2025


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 3:12 AM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 PROBATION 22 Form as to Larby Amirouche accepting jurisdiction from USDC Eastern District of New York, Brooklyn, Case number 1:21-cr-00064. Mailed certified copy of transfer form with letter requesting file to USDC Eastern District of New York, Brooklyn. (aee, )
Related: [-]
2 2 SPECIAL Report - Warrant Request as to Larby Amirouche (SEALED) (Vinyard, Samuel)
Related: [-]