North Carolina Middle District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00151
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 3:55 AM EDT
Defendant
RUTH CHISINA MUFUTE (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SUNGTAE KANG
Doj-Crm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 5:19 AM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 INDICTMENT as to RUTH CHISINA MUFUTE (1) count(s) 1, 2-5. (lg) Modified on 4/29/2025 to replace document. (dk)
Related: [-]