New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00909
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 1:46 AM MDT
Defendant
Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez (1)
Represented By
Cesar Pierce-Varela
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Jennifer D Ramos
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Silvia Teresa Delgado
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 3:04 AM MDT
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
Arrest of Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez (kls) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
Hearing as to Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez: Initial Appearance set for 4/4/2025 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (kls) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Ramos, Jennifer) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez. Attorney Silvia Teresa Delgado for USA added. (cer) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez. (cer) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
2 2 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Initial Appearance as to Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez held on 4/4/2025. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Appearances: AUSA: Jared Kirk Anthony Williams; AFPD: Joe G Jacinto; FPD Standing In; Interpreter: Carolina Duran. Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 9:07 AM - 9:12 AM. Time In Session: 9:30 AM - 9:35 AM. Courtroom Deputy: Veronica Ruiz. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea for 4/9/2025, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (cer) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
3 3 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (cer) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Cesar Pierce-Varela for Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (bw) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
6 6 WAIVER of Hearings by Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez (Pierce-Varela, Cesar) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. The Court having reviewed the waiver of preliminary hearing, waiver of personal presence at the preliminary hearing and request for tolling of Grand Jury presentment and waiver of detention, now finds that the ends of justice served by granting the request to toll the speedy indictment computation outweigh the interest of the defendant and the public in a speedy indictment. The Court expressly finds that the public's interest in a speedy indictment in this case is outweighed by: (I) the public's interest in a reasonably expeditious resolution of the case; (2) the public's interest in relieving the burden that would be placed on judicial, prosecutorial, defense, and law enforcement resources if the case proceeded to a preliminary examination and/or a speedy indictment; and (3) the potential benefit conferred upon the defendant in an expedited resolution of the case. IT IS THEREFORE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED. and DECREED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A), a period of time of 75 days from today's date is hereby tolled and excluded from the computation of speedy indictment. At the expiration of this 75-day period, the 30-day period pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(b) for speedy indictment shall resume. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary and detention hearings are vacated. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vh) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (vh) [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jorge Antonio Valenzuela-Cortez: Change of Plea Hearing set for 4/28/2025 at 01:31 PM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. [ Interpreter Needed ](vrr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00620-KRS]
Related: [-]