Indiana Northern District Court
Case #: 2:25-mj-00072
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 3:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Devon Antown Bussell (1)
Represented By
Matthew D Soliday - FCD
Federal Community Defenders Inc - Ham/in
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Patrick Grindlay - AUSA
Us District Court - Ham/in
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 4:10 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
Arrest (Rule 5) of Devon Antown Bussell (smb)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs Rule 5c3 Documents Received as to Devon Antown Bussell. (rmf) (rmf).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/29/2025) Restricted Document
2 2 ORDER as to Devon Antown Bussell re1 Rule 5c3 Documents Received. ZOOM Initial Appearance - Rule 5c3 set for 4/29/2025 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge John E Martin by way of video teleconference. The Clerk is directed to notify the FCD Office for appointment of counsel. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 4/29/2025. (smb)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew D Soliday - FCD appearing for Devon Antown Bussell (Soliday - FCD, Matthew)
Related: [-]