New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00046
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 3:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Stanley Olejniczak (1)
Represented By
Carla J. Benz
Benz Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Casey L. Chalbeck
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Bflo
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 4:19 AM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Take Guilty Plea to Hon. Michael J. Roemer as to Stanley Olejniczak. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 3/31/25. (JHF)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Stanley Olejniczak. Defendant verbally accepted waiver of indictment in Court on 3/31/25. (JHF)
Related: [-]
3 3 INFORMATION as to Stanley Olejniczak (1) count(s) 1. (JHF)
Related: [-]
4 4 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Stanley Olejniczak. (JHF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: AUSA Casey L. Chalbeck on behalf of government; AFPD Carla J. Benz w/defendant Stanley Olejniczak. Change of Plea Hearing as to Stanley Olejniczak held on 3/31/2025. Court accepted and approved Stipulation to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge for entry of guilty plea. Court conducted colloquy with defendant. Defendant waived indictment. Court found knowing and voluntary decision to plea. Defendant entered plea of guilty to Count 1 of the Information. Court made oral recommendation that the plea be accepted by the Hon. Richard J. Arcara. Written Report and Recommendation to follow. Sentencing submission schedule and date shall be set by Judge Arcara's Chambers. Defendant continued to be detained. -PROBATION NOTIFIED OF PLEA- (Court Reporter FTR Gold.)(RAZ)
Related: [-]
6 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Plea of Guilty as to Stanley Olejniczak. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/31/2025.(RAZ)
Related: [-]