Texas Northern District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-00229
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eric B. Chen-DOJ
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Erick Avila (1)
Terminated: 03/31/2025
Represented By
Pia R Lederman - FPD
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 3:20 AM CDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
Arrest (Rule 32.1) of Erick Avila. Case Number DR:23-CR-619(1)-TAD from Western District of Texas, Del Rio Division. (mcrd)
Related: [-]
1 1 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Erick Avila. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/31/2025) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
2 2 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr: Initial Appearance on Rule 32.1 as to Erick Avila held on 3/31/2025. Date of Arrest: 3/31/2025 on warrant and petition from Western District of Texas, Del Rio Division; Deft appeared w/counsel; Deft executed financial affidavit; O/appointing FPD entered; Deft waives Rule 32.1 hearing as to identity and requests preliminary hearing in charging district; O/commitment to charging district entered; Deft remanded to custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Eric Chen; Defense - Pia Lederman. (No exhibits) Time in Court - :06. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (USPO Long.) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER of Rule 32.1 Hearings by Erick Avila (mcrd)
Related: [-]
4 4 Report of Proceedings under Rule 32.1 and Order Entered Thereon as to Erick Avila. Defendant is removed forthwith to the district in which he is charged. Paperwork sent to Western District of Texas, Del Rio Division. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/31/2025) (mcrd)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice FROM Texas Northern TO Western District of Texas, Del Rio of a Rule 5, Rule 32.1, or Rule 40 Appearance as to Erick Avila. Your case number is: DR:23-CR-619(1)-TAD. Docket sheet and documents attached. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to the national list host at InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (mcrd)
Related: [-]