Original Case: 1:21-cv-04471

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01721
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 4:33 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Robert Douglas Leighton
GOLDBERG KOHN LTD.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TRADITION MEDIA GROUP, LLC
Represented By
Mark R. Bagley
TOLPIN & PARTNERS, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 4:32 AM CDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/12/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/09/2025 for Tradition Media Group, LLC. [1] [7449278] 25-1721 (CG) [Entered: 04/29/2025 10:44 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 24 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court