Original Case: 1:24-cv-00220

First Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-civil-01394
Typecivil / private / fraud
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN ROE
Represented By
John Edward Durkin
Burns Bryant Cox Rockefeller & Durkin PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JANE ROE
Represented By
John Edward Durkin
Burns Bryant Cox Rockefeller & Durkin PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBIN D. MELONE
Represented By
Linda M. Smith
Morrison Mahoney LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KATHERINE THONIS
Represented By
Brittney M. White
Hamblett & Kerrigan PA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DUSTY BUTTON
Represented By
Dusty Button
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MITCHELL TAYLOR BUTTON
Represented By
Mitchell Taylor Button
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 5:30 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
Request to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal filed by Appellants Dusty Button and Mitchell Taylor Button was granted in the district court by order dated 04/22/2025. 25-1394 (JW)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #72) filed by Appellants Dusty Button and Mitchell Taylor Button. 25-1394 (JW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 50 pgs Abbreviated Record
Att: 2 7 pgs Case Opening Notice
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice Regarding Native PDF