Original Case: 3:24-cv-00110

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.us-01467
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
ROSEWELL PAIGE
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN HENRY O'BRION, JR.
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES WATSON MORRIS, III
Defendant - Appellee
DANIEL T. BALFOUR
Defendant - Appellee
SHILLING & ASSOCIATES
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM RIVES CURDTS
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES R. SPENCER, Judge of the United States District Court
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES WARD
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT BROOKS, Lawyer
Defendant - Appellee
PAUL THOMAS BUCKWALTER, II
Defendant - Appellee
CHESTERFIELD COUNTY COMMONWEALTH ATTORNEY OFFICE
Defendant - Appellee
MARY WHEELING MARTELINO
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHRISTOS D. DEDES
Represented By
Christos D. Dedes
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 4:24 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:24-cv-00110-RCY. Case manager: SBatchleor. [1001762067] 25-1467 SAB [Entered: 04/29/2025 03:35 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs FEE NOTICE issued to Christos D. Dedes - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 05/29/2025. Originating case number: 3:24-cv-00110-RCY. Mailed to: C. Dedes. [1001762122] 25-1467 SAB [Entered: 04/29/2025 04:40 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: C. Dedes. [1001762124] Informal Opening Brief due 05/23/2025. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 25-1467 SAB [Entered: 04/29/2025 04:43 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001762126]. Due: 05/13/2025. 25-1467 SAB [Entered: 04/29/2025 04:45 PM]
Related: [-]