Original Case: 8:23-cv-02442

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.us-01468
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT F. KENNEDY, JR., Secretary Department of Health and Human Services Agency
Represented By
Molissa Heather Farber
UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF MARYLAND
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GIBAO EMMANUEL KANI-GOBA
Represented By
Gibao Emmanuel Kani-Goba
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 4:24 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:23-cv-02442-BAH. Case manager: EBorneisen. [1001761936] 25-1468 EB [Entered: 04/29/2025 02:20 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 IFP APPLICATION transferred from district court (court access only). [1001761941] 25-1468 EB [Entered: 04/29/2025 02:23 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001761945]. Due: 05/13/2025. 25-1468 EB [Entered: 04/29/2025 02:25 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER filed granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis [2]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Gibao Emmanuel Kani-Goba. [1001762078] 25-1468 EB [Entered: 04/29/2025 03:43 PM]
Related: [-]
5 5 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Gibao Emmanuel Kani-Goba. [1001762082] Informal Opening Brief due 05/23/2025. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 25-1468 EB [Entered: 04/29/2025 03:45 PM]
Related: [-]