Original Case: 1:18-cv-06017

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01725
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 4:33 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By
Jordan F. Yurchich
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
YOLANDA COLLIER, Officer, P.O. #19806
Represented By
Jordan F. Yurchich
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SHARMAUN FREEMAN, Officer, P.O. #11568
Represented By
Jordan F. Yurchich
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MICHAEL ARQUERO
Represented By
Gregory E. Kulis
GREGORY E. KULIS & ASSOCIATES
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 4:31 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Transcript information sheet due by 05/13/2025. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Michael Arquero by 05/05/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/09/2025 for Michael Arquero. [1] [7449362] 25-1725 (FP) [Entered: 04/29/2025 01:40 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 39 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court