Original Case: 1:23-cv-03330

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvpri-07064
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
Russian Federation
Represented By
Kevin Arthur Meehan
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP
contact info
Joseph D. Pizzurro
Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
JSC DTEK Krymenergo
Represented By
Marney Leigh Cheek
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 5:31 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-7064
Related: [-]
25 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2113404] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:23-cv-03330-CJN filed by Russian Federation. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-7064 25-7064
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2113408] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/29/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/29/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/29/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/29/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/29/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/29/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/29/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/29/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/13/2025; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/29/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/29/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/29/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/13/2025 25-7064
Related: [-]
1 pgs LETTER [2113412] sent regarding attorney membership to Marney Leigh Cheek for JSC DTEK Krymenergo. Application for Admission due 05/29/2025. 25-7064
Related: [-]