Delaware District Court
Judge:Maryellen Noreika
Case #: 1:25-cv-00520
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Case in other court:US BK/DE, 24-10349 (TMH)

Debtor
Charge Enterprises, Inc.

,
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 10:02 AM EDT
Appellant
AI Amped I LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Appellant
AI Amped II, LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Appellant
Arena Origination Co., LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Appellant
Arena Special Opportunities Fund, LP
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Appellant
Arena Special Opportunities Partners I, LP
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Appellant
Mt. Whitney Securities, LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Michael J. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Appellee
Craig Denson
Represented By
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Robert Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Kate Roggio Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Appellee
Andrew Fox
Represented By
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Robert Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Kate Roggio Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Appellee
Amy Hanson
Represented By
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Robert Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Kate Roggio Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Appellee
Leah Schweller
Represented By
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Robert Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Kate Roggio Buck
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:10 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
order Oral Order Thu 05/01 11:43 AM
ORAL ORDER: Pursuant to this Court's July 19, 2023 Standing Order regarding procedures governing mediation of all appeals from the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Delaware, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on or before May 22, 2025 by 4:00 p.m., the parties shall submit to the Clerk of the Court a joint letter, no longer than three (3) single-spaced pages in 12-point font, in which the parties shall: (1) state their respective positions as to whether mediation of the instant case by a United States Magistrate Judge would or would not be beneficial at this time (and why); and (2) advise whether the parties previously attempted mediation or some other ADR process. Should the parties advise that mediation would not be beneficial at this time, and that the case should be removed from the Court's mandatory mediation process, the parties should also include a proposed briefing schedule for the instant appeal. The parties' letters shall not be docketed, but shall instead be e-mailed to Randall Lohan at DED_BankruptcyAppeals@ded.uscourts.gov. Ordered by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 5/1/2025. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 notice Bankruptcy Appeal - Notice of Docketing - Mediation Wed 04/30 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Appeal. (mrr)
Related: [-]
1 1 appeal Bankruptcy Appeal Wed 04/30 9:53 AM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT appealing the Order entered on 04/15/2025 by Thomas M. Horan in Bankruptcy case number 24-10349 (TMH). Fee Status Paid.- filed by Arena Special Opportunities Fund, LP, AI Amped I LLC, Arena Special Opportunities Partners I, LP, Arena Origination Co., LLC, AI Amped II, LLC.(mrr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order on Appeal,
Att: 2 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal
notice Bankruptcy Appeal - No Designation of Record Filed Wed 04/30 9:54 AM
NO DESIGNATION OF RECORD FILED (mrr)
Related: [-]
appeal Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability Wed 04/30 9:55 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability. DESIGNATED RECORD on Appeal is available electronically from the docket sheet on file in the Bankruptcy Court. Please do not send paper courtesy copies of the record on appeal to the Clerk's Office unless otherwise directed by chambers. (mrr)
Related: [-]