Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Anne C Conway
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:25-cv-00758
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Case in other court:Ninth Judicial Circuit, 2025-CA-002651
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 11:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By
Katelyn Papa
Rolfes Henry Lpa
contact info
Plaintiff
Chadwick Tippit


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
5 5 order Interested Persons Order Thu 05/01 11:50 AM
INITIAL CASE ORDER - Notice of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Parties have 14 days from the date of this order to file their disclosure statement (if not already filed) and to notify the court of a related action (not required if there are no related actions). Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 5/1/2025. (KLD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 04/30 2:23 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Anne C. Conway and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:25-cv-00758-ACC-RMN. (JOS)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 04/30 10:57 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan identifying Corporate Parent Fire Insurance Exchange for Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan.. (Papa, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 04/30 10:52 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. Related case(s): No (Papa, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 04/30 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 2025-CA-002651 filed in State Court on 03/28/2025. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-23303876 filed by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan.(Papa, Katelyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A also State Court COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 9 State Court Other Documents,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet