Maine District Court
Judge:John A Woodcock, Jr
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 2:25-cv-00211
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1345 USA Plaintiff
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 30, 2025 11:07 AM EDT
Defendant
MELISSA E HATCH
Defendant
NICHOLAS S SEVERY
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By
KEVIN J. CROSMAN
Jensen Baird
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
4 4 misc Certificate of Filing of Complaint for Foreclosure Wed 04/30 9:10 AM
Certificate of Filing of Complaint for Foreclosure. Original attested document forwarded to the Plaintiff. (jlm)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 04/30 9:09 AM
Summons Issued as to MELISSA E HATCH, NICHOLAS S SEVERY. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (jlm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - N - Severy
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 04/30 9:01 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jlm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 04/30 9:01 AM
COMPLAINT against MELISSA E HATCH, NICHOLAS S SEVERY, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE. (Service of Process Deadline 7/28/2025)(jlm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Mortgage,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Demand